VA SB609 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Tabled in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Tabled in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Academic credit; industry credentials. Requires the State Board for Community Colleges to adopt a policy for the award of academic credit to any student enrolled in a comprehensive community college who has successfully completed a third-party industry credential identified as in demand and applicable to the student's certificate or degree program requirements. The bill also requires the State Board, in consultation with the Virginia Board of Workforce Development and local business and industry leaders, to identify in-demand third-party industry credentials for each community college region.
Title
Academic credit; industry credentials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Tabled in Education by voice vote |
2016-02-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16103416D |