VA SB60 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Timing of required submission of capital outlay bill. Requires the Governor to submit, in each legislative session, a prefiled bill with amendments to the current six-year capital outlay plan enacted into law. Under current law, the Governor is required to submit amendments by December 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital outlay bill; timing of required submission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB60ER)
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled
2020-03-05SenateTitle replaced 20108884D-H1
2020-03-05SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB60H1
2020-03-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108884D-H1
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108884D-H1
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned App. sub: Capital Outlay
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-20SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-19SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2019-11-19SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100266D

Same As/Similar To

HB1248 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/20)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221518(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB60&201+sum+SB60
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB60+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB60H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB60ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0008+SB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0057SB0060+SB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0067SB0060+SB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0204V0006+SB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0416+SB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0456+SB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0496+SB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1860+SB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1543SB0060+SB0060

Bill Comments

feedback