VA HB1248 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Timing of required submission of capital outlay bill. Requires the Governor to submit, in each legislative session, a prefiled bill with amendments to the current six-year capital outlay plan enacted into law. Under current law, the Governor is required to submit amendments by December 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital outlay bill; timing of required submission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
2020-03-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSigned by President
2020-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1248ER)
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-24HouseVOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HousePrinted as engrossed 20102959D-E
2020-01-23HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1248E
2020-01-23HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-23HouseRead second time
2020-01-22HouseRead first time
2020-01-20HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned App. sub: Capital Outlay
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102959D

Same As/Similar To

SB60 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0864)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221518(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1248&201+sum+HB1248
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1248+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1248E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1248ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0254+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0204V0004+HB1248
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0002+HB1248
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0043+HB1248
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0344+HB1248
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0734HB1248+HB1248
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0751HB1248+HB1248

Bill Comments

feedback