VA SB596 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Auxiliary grants; third-party payments. Provides that assisted living facilities and adult foster care homes may accept payments from third parties for certain goods and services provided to auxiliary grant recipients provided certain requirements are met. The Department of Social Services shall not count such payments as income for the purpose of determining eligibility for or calculating the amount of an auxiliary grant. The bill also provides that assisted living facilities and adult foster care homes shall provide each auxiliary grant recipient with a written list of the goods and services that are covered by the auxiliary grant.
Title
Assisted living facilities and adult foster care homes; may accept third-party payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128) | |
2012-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 128 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB596ER) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB596S1 | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104798D-S1 | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104798D-S1 | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103060D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1211 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)