VA HB1211 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Auxiliary grants; third-party payments. Provides that assisted living facilities and adult foster care homes may accept payments from third parties for certain goods and services provided to auxiliary grant recipients provided certain requirements are met. The Department of Social Services shall not count such payments as income for the purpose of determining eligibility for or calculating the amount of an auxiliary grant. The bill also provides that assisted living facilities and adult foster care homes shall provide each auxiliary grant recipient with a written list of the goods and services that are covered by the auxiliary grant.
Title
Assisted living facilities and adult foster care homes; may accept third-party payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387) | |
2012-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 387 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1211ER) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1211H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104862D-H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104862D-H1 | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103152D |
Same As/Similar To
SB596 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)