VA SB576 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stream restoration; standards and specifications. Allows a person engaging in more than one jurisdiction in the creation and operation of a stream restoration project for purposes of reducing nutrients or sediment entering state waters the same opportunity to submit standards and specifications for Department of Environmental Quality approval that describe how land-disturbing activities shall be conducted as an alternative to submitting soil erosion control and stormwater management plans as allowed in current law to a person engaging in more than one jurisdiction in the creation and operation of a wetland mitigation or stream restoration bank pursuant to a mitigation banking instrument signed by the Department, the Marine Resources Commission, or the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. The bill also authorizes such person to file general erosion and sediment control standards and specifications for review and approval consistent with guidelines established by the State Water Control Board.
Title
Stream restoration; standards and specifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 627 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB576ER) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB576S1 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18104993D-S1 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18104993D-S1 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103641D |