VA SB563 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax exemption; materials and equipment used to drill natural gas and oil. Extends the sunset from July 1, 2016, to July 1, 2022, for the sales and use tax exemption for machinery and tools, materials, and supplies used to drill, extract, or process natural gas or oil.
Title
RS&UT; exemption for materials & equipment used to drill natural gas & oil, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 673 (effective - see bill) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB563ER) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16102737D-E |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB563E |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102737D |