VA SB562 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
College partnership laboratory schools; tuition. Authorizes the school board of a school division that partners with a college partnership laboratory school to charge tuition to students enrolled in the college partnership laboratory school who do not reside within the partnering division.
Title
College partnership laboratory schools; tuition.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 754 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB562ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-24 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14101276D |