VA SB562 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; Campbell County. Adds Campbell County to the list of counties authorized to impose a transient occupancy tax not to exceed five percent.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; adds Campbell County to list authorized to impose.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 27-N) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290) | |
2012-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 290 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB562ER) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 27-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Passed House (70-Y 27-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 8-N) | |
2012-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103643D |