VA SB555 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 377 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Voting restrictions on the basis of race. Repeals several Acts of Assembly that implemented and enforced a state poll tax and provided for separate registration records on the basis of race.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting; restrictions on the basis of race.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 377 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-04SenateSigned by President
2020-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-03SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB555ER)
2020-03-03SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102509D

Same As/Similar To

HB1086 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 350 (effective 7/1/20)

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback