VA HB1086 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1086ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Voting restrictions on the basis of race. Repeals several Acts of Assembly that implemented and enforced a state poll tax and provided for separate registration records on the basis of race.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting; restrictions on the basis of race.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1086ER)
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102511D

Same As/Similar To

SB555 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback