VA SB54 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Chesapeake Airport Authority. Removes language in the Chesapeake Airport Authority authorizing language related to removal of Authority members from office that conflicts with language added in 2017 specifying that members of the Authority serve at the pleasure of the Chesapeake City Council.
Title
Chesapeake Airport Authority; removes language Authority authorizing language related to removal of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB54ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100640D |