VA SB527 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers. Expands the definition of "franchised motor vehicle dealer" to include used car dealerships operating under the trademark of a manufacturer. The bill also defines the relevant market area applicable to dealers of heavy trucks and limits the certain control that may be exercised over the development and operation of a motor vehicle dealer's premises due to its franchise relationship with the manufacturer. The bill also addresses certain practices relating to warranty and sales incentive audits to guarantee motor vehicle dealers the right to return parts sent by automated ordering system. It also limits the power of a manufacturer to coerce the waiver of a motor vehicle dealer's rights under any contract or other law; and to clarify hearing procedures. This bill contains an emergency clause, but is otherwise identical to
Title
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers; addresses certain practices relating to warranty, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318) | |
2010-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 318 (effective 4/9/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB527ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-03-01 | House: Amendment by Delegate Athey agreed to | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-23 | House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 10104808D-S1 (Norment) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB527S1 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Norment agreed to 10104808D-S1 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Committee amendments rejected | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103661D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1569 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1571 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1572.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1573 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1573.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1573.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |