VA SB513 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; data centers. Provides that if data center fixtures are taxed as part of the real property where they are located, they shall be valued based on depreciated reproduction or replacement cost, rather than based on the amount of income they generate.
Title
Data centers; center fixtures are taxed as part of the real property where they are located, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 672 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB513ER) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104161D |
Same As/Similar To
HB791 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
HB791 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
HB791 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3295.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |