VA SB5106 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local land use approvals; extension of approvals to address the COVID-19 pandemic. Extends until at least July 1, 2022, the sunset date for various local land use approvals that were valid and outstanding as of July 1, 2020.
Title
Local land use approvals; extension of approvals to address the COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 4-N) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 4-N) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040) | |
2020-10-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 40 (effective 3/1/21) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020 | |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020 |
2020-10-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5106ER) |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-10-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-10-07 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | Passed House with amendment (89-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-10-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-10-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-10-07 | House | Read third time |
2020-10-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-10-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-29 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-21 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 4-N) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5106S1 |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20200900D-S1 |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Incorporates SB5044 (Deeds) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20200900D-S1 |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 1-N) |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200760D |
Same As/Similar To
SB5044 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Incorporated by Local Government