VA SB510 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authenticity and reasonableness of medical bills; presumption; who may identify and provide testimony. Allows a plaintiff's guardian, agent under an advance directive, agent under a power of attorney, or next friend to identify a medical bill and provide testimony on the bill to establish a rebuttable presumption of authenticity and reasonableness of the bill where the court finds the plaintiff is unable to provide such testimony. Current law requires the plaintiff to identify and provide testimony on the bill.
Title
Medical bills; who may identify and provide testimony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB510S1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104489D-S1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104489D-S1 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103363D |