VA SB5029 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 7 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor's recommendation received by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Issuing citations; possession of marijuana and certain traffic offenses. Provides that no law-enforcement officer may lawfully stop a motor vehicle for operating (i) without a light illuminating a license plate, (ii) with defective and unsafe equipment, (iii) without brake lights or a high mount stop light, (iv) without an exhaust system that prevents excessive or unusual levels of noise, (v) with certain sun-shading materials and tinting films, and (vi) with certain objects suspended in the vehicle. No evidence discovered or obtained as a result of such unlawful stop shall be admissible in any trial, hearing, or other proceeding. The bill also provides that no law-enforcement officer may lawfully stop, search, or seize any person, place, or thing solely on the basis of the odor of marijuana, and no evidence discovered or obtained as a result of such unlawful search or seizure shall be admissible in any trial, hearing, or other proceeding. The bill prohibits the enactment of a local ordinance establishing a primary offense when the corresponding provision in the Code of Virginia is a secondary offense. The bill prohibits any local ordinance relating to the ownership or maintenance of a motor vehicle from being cause to stop or arrest a driver of a motor vehicle unless such violation is a jailable offense. The bill prohibits a law-enforcement officer from stopping a pedestrian for jaywalking or entering a highway where the pedestrian cannot be seen. The bill provides that law-enforcement officers are not permitted to stop a motor vehicle for an expired safety inspection or registration sticker until the first day of the fourth month after the original expiration date. The bill also provides that no evidence discovered or obtained due to an impermissible stop, including evidence obtained with the person's consent, is admissible in any trial, hearing, or other proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana and certain traffic offenses; issuing citations, etc,

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 45-N) (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 3-N) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 14-N) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-10-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
2020-10-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-07SenateSigned by President
2020-10-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5029ER)
2020-10-07SenateEnrolled
2020-10-02SenateTitle replaced 20201242D-H1
2020-10-02SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2020-09-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (51-Y 45-N)
2020-09-25HousePassed House with substitute (51-Y 45-N)
2020-09-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB5029H1
2020-09-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201242D-H1
2020-09-25HouseRead third time
2020-09-24HouseRead second time
2020-09-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201242D-H1
2020-09-22HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-08-28SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 15-N)
2020-08-28SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 3-N)
2020-08-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 14-N)
2020-08-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5029S1
2020-08-27SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20200915D-S1
2020-08-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-08-27SenateRead second time
2020-08-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
2020-08-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 20200915D-S1
2020-08-20SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2020-08-18SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2020-08-18SenateRereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2020-08-13SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-08-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200057D

Same As/Similar To

HB5058 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Governor's recommendation received by House

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152919(n/a)See Bill Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
4621013(n/a)See Bill Text
4621049(n/a)See Bill Text
4621052(n/a)See Bill Text
4621053(n/a)See Bill Text
4621054(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5029&202+sum+SB5029
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5029+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5029S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5029H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5029ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S11V0001+SB5029
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0022+SB5029
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0032SB5029+SB5029
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0048SB5029+SB5029
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0050SB5029+SB5029
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0051SB5029+SB5029
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0030+SB5029
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0086+SB5029
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0195SB5029+SB5029

Bill Comments

feedback