VA SB500 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-12 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-12 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Summary
Infectious disease presumption; emergency declaration by Governor. Authorizes the Governor to declare that a communicable, contagious or infectious disease, is a disease that is covered by the existing infectious disease presumption for firefighters, paramedics, emergency medical technicians, and certain law-enforcement officers under the Virginia Workers Compensation Act. The presumption currently exists for hepatitis, meningococcal meningitis, tuberculosis, and HIV. Such a declaration may be made after the Board of Health has issued an order for the purpose of suppressing the outbreak of the disease and the Governor has declared a state of emergency due to an outbreak of the disease that poses a danger to the life and health of the public.
Title
Infectious disease presumption; emergency declaration by Governor.
Sponsors
Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Mark Herring [D] | Sen. Ralph Northam [D] |
Sen. Richard Saslaw [D] | Sen. Mary Whipple [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-20 | House: Assigned C & L sub: 1 | |
2008-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-18 | House: Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 081146286-E | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB500E | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Rereferred to Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081146286 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB500 |