VA SB498 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Opening of the 2010 - 2011 school year in Pittsylvania County. Authorizes the Pittsylvania County School Board to set the opening of the 2010 - 2011 school year so that the first day students are required to attend school shall be one week prior to Labor Day.
Title
School calendar; opening of school year in Pittsylvania County.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hurt [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Rereferred to Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (21-Y 19-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101859D |