VA SB49 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonpayment of wages; investigations. Authorizes the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, if he acquires information during an investigation of a complaint of an employer's failure or refusal to pay wages and that information creates a reasonable belief that other employees of the same employer may not have been paid wages, to investigate whether the employer has failed or refused to make a required payment of wages to other employees. The measure also provides that if the Commissioner finds in the course of such investigation that the employer has committed a violation, the Commissioner may institute proceedings on behalf of any employee against his employer. In such proceedings, the Commissioner is not required to have obtained a written complaint of the violation or the written and signed consent of any employee.
Title
Nonpayment of wages; investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 205 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB49ER) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (14-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100694D |
Same As/Similar To
HB336 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206)