VA HB336 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonpayment of wages; investigations. Authorizes the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, if he acquires information during an investigation of a complaint of an employer's failure or refusal to pay wages and that information creates a reasonable belief that other employees of the same employer may not have been paid wages, to investigate whether the employer has failed or refused to make a required payment of wages to other employees. The measure also provides that if the Commissioner finds in the course of such investigation that the employer has committed a violation, the Commissioner may institute proceedings on behalf of any employee against his employer. In such proceedings, the Commissioner is not required to have obtained a written complaint of the violation or the written and signed consent of any employee.
Title
Nonpayment of wages; investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 206 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB336ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (62-Y 37-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102626D |
Same As/Similar To
SB49 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)