VA SB486 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Treasury; Risk Management Division; liability coverage for certain pro bono attorneys. Provides for inclusion under the state's risk management plan of attorneys providing pro bono legal services under a Virginia State Bar approved program. The bill requires the Virginia State Bar to pay the cost of coverage for eligible attorneys.
Title
Treasury, Dept. of, Risk Management Division; liability coverage for certain pro bono attorneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 708 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB486ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101664D |
Same As/Similar To
HB712 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)