VA SB476 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Confidential juvenile records; sharing with state, local, and regional correctional facilities. Provides for the sharing of juvenile records with state and local correctional facilities when such facility has custody of or is providing supervision for a person convicted as an adult who is the subject of such records.
Title
Confidential juvenile records; sharing with state and local correctional facilities, confidential.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262) | |
2012-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 262 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB476ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Title replaced 12105446D-H1 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB476H1 | |
2012-02-21 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105446D-H1 | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105446D-H1 | |
2012-02-17 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB476S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104373D-S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104373D-S1 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101740D |