VA SB47 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Firearm transfers to another person from a prohibited person. Provides that a person who is prohibited from possessing a firearm because such person is subject to a protective order or has been convicted of an assault and battery of a family or household member may transfer a firearm owned by such prohibited person to any person who is not otherwise prohibited by law from possessing such firearm, provided that such person who is not otherwise prohibited by law from possessing such firearm is 21 years of age or older and does not reside with the person who is subject to the protective order. Under current law, there is no requirement that such transferee cannot be younger than 21 years of age and cannot reside with such prohibited person. The bill also provides that such prohibited person who transfers, sells, or surrenders a firearm pursuant to the provisions of the bill shall inform the clerk of the court of the name and address of the transferee, the federally licensed firearms dealer, or the law-enforcement agency in possession of the firearm and shall provide a copy of such form to the transferee. The bill also provides that a person who is prohibited from possessing a firearm because such person is subject to a protective order or has been convicted of an assault and battery of a family or household member shall be advised that a law-enforcement officer may obtain a search warrant to search for any firearms from such person if such law-enforcement officer has reason to believe that such person has not relinquished all firearms in his possession.
Title
Firearm; transfers to another person from a prohibited person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Requires 2/3 members present |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB47ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (52-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104086D |
Same As/Similar To
HB46 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.1:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |