VA SB467 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
Summary
VPA employee retirement benefits. Enables the Virginia Port Authority to establish a trust to help offset its OPEB (other postemployment benefits) liability. The changes mirror changes made to VRS during the 2007 Session.
Title
Port Authority; establish trust to help offset its postemployment benefits liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622) | |
2008-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB467ER) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-27 | House: Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Jones, S.C.) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 081164828-E | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB467E | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081164828 |
Subjects
Authorities
Fiduciaries Generally
Labor and Employment
Pensions, Benefits and Retirement
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Fiduciaries Generally
Labor and Employment
Pensions, Benefits and Retirement
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB467 |