VA SB458 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 55-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 55-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; suspensions. Directs the Board of Education to establish guidelines for alternatives to short-term and long-term suspension for consideration by local school boards.
Title
Alternatives to suspension; Board of Education shall establish guidelines for local school boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 55-N) (Y: 45 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 55-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Defeated by House (43-Y 55-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB458S1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105493D-S1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105493D-S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101986D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 277 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |