VA SB441 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; winery license privileges. Allows winery licensees to sell wine at retail on the premises described in the winery license for on-premises consumption or in closed containers for off-premises consumption, provided that such wine is manufactured on the licensed premises.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; winery license privileges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1008) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1008 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB441ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Title replaced 20108905D-H1 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (92-Y 4-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House with substitute (92-Y 4-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB441H1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108905D-H1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108905D-H1 |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20100875D-E |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB441E |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100875D |