VA SB43 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Time of municipal elections. Clarifies that a city or town may move the time of its local elections to the November general election pursuant to statutory authority notwithstanding any contrary provisions of its charter.
Title
Municipal elections; clarifies that a city or town may move the time of its local elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0402) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 402 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB43ER) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Petersen rejected |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N) |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101686D |