VA SB429 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal history record checks for firearms; required forms. Provides that only certain information about the purchaser may be required on the State Police form to be completed when purchasing a firearm.
Title
Criminal history record information check; required forms upon sale of a firearm.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2012-02-17 | House | Continued to 2013 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2012-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-02-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2012-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2012-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2012-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB429S1 |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 12104824D-S1 |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 12104824D-S1 |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100790D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |