VA SB423 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0423)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0423)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Asset forfeiture. Prohibits a law-enforcement agency from requesting, requiring, or otherwise inducing a person who asserts a lawful right to property seized for the purpose of forfeiture to waive his interest in or rights to the property until an information is filed. The bill allows attorneys for the Commonwealth to electronically notify the Department of Motor Vehicles, in a manner approved by the Commissioner, that a vehicle has been seized. A provision is added allowing a forfeiture proceeding to be stayed if it is also related to a warrant. The Department of Criminal Justice Services will be required to prepare an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly regarding information on all drug and nondrug asset seizures and forfeitures. The report shall be available to the public. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Asset forfeiture; seizure of property, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0423) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0423) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 423 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB423ER) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-02-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102898D |
Same As/Similar To
HB771 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 386.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |