VA SB414 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Competitive foods in public schools; report. Requires the Board of Education, in cooperation with the Department of Health, to promulgate and periodically update regulations setting nutritional guidelines for all competitive foods sold to students during regular school hours. The bill also requires (i) the Board to adopt either the Alliance for a Healthier Generation's Competitive Foods Guidelines or the Institute of Medicine's Recommended Standards for Competitive Foods in Schools as the initial statewide standard for competitive foods, and (ii) the Board to report to the General Assembly on the final regulations by December 1, 2011. This bill incorporates
Title
Nutritional guideline; Board and VDH to develop for all competitive foods in public schools, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 718 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-14 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB414ER) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Title replaced 10105660D-H1 | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB414H1 | |
2010-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105660D-H1 | |
2010-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105660D-H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Education sub: #2 Students and Daycare | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB414S1 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104613D-S1 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104613D-S1 | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103725D |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Similar To) 2010-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health (SB414-Vogel) (13-Y 0-N)