VA SB369 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Telemedicine pilot program. Directs the Center for Telehealth of the University of Virginia and the Virginia Telehealth Network to establish a pilot program to expand access to and improve coordination and quality of health care services in rural areas and medically underserved areas of the Commonwealth through the use of telemedicine. Such pilot program shall include a process for establishing and providing support to patient care teams and for assisting nurse practitioners who seek to participate in the pilot program with identifying and developing written practice agreements with patient care team physicians. The Center for Telehealth shall report to the General Assembly and the Governor on the results of the pilot program by October 15, 2017. The bill also provides that in the case of psychiatric services provided to individuals receiving services from a community services board, free health clinic, or federally qualified health center by a practitioner engaged by the Center for Telehealth of the University of Virginia to deliver such services, the requirement for an appropriate examination shall be satisfied through the use of telemedicine. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telemedicine pilot program; to expand access, etc., to health care services in certain areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
2016-04-20HouseEnacted, Chapter 763 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2016-04-20SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2016-04-20SenateReenrolled bill text (SB369ER2)
2016-04-20SenateReenrolled
2016-04-20 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2016-04-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (92-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2016-04-04SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2016-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/16/16
2016-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-11SenateSigned by President
2016-03-11SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB369ER)
2016-03-11SenateEnrolled
2016-03-10SenateTitle replaced 16106068D-H1
2016-03-10SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2016-03-10HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2016-03-10HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2016-03-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB369H1
2016-03-10HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 16106068D-H1
2016-03-10HouseCommittee amendment rejected
2016-03-10HouseRead third time
2016-03-09HouseRead second time
2016-03-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 16106068D-H1
2016-03-07HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2016-03-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
2016-02-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2016-02-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2016-02-25HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2016-02-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2016-02-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
2016-02-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2016-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2016-02-17HouseRead first time
2016-02-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-12SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB369S2
2016-02-12SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 16105368D-S2
2016-02-12SenateReading of substitute waived
2016-02-12SenateCommittee substitute rejected 16105181D-S1
2016-02-12SenateReading of substitute waived
2016-02-12SenateRead second time
2016-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2016-02-10SenateCommittee substitute printed 16105368D-S2
2016-02-10SenateReported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2016-02-04SenateRereferred to Finance
2016-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 16105181D-S1
2016-02-04SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2016-01-21SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2016-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2016-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103577D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412957(n/a)See Bill Text
5412957.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+SB369
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB369+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB369S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB369S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB369H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB369ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB369ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0763+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S04V0074+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S05V0117+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0336SB0369+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0353SB0369+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0354SB0369+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H1201V0022+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H12V0170+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0206V0015+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0206V0020+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H02V0143+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1309+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1023SB0369+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1121SB0369+SB0369
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1445+SB0369

Bill Comments

feedback