VA SB318 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Release of balloons; prohibition. Reduces the number of balloons per hour that a person may release without penalty from 49 to one.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Balloons; reduces the number per hour that a person may release.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Pending question, not ordered (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (7-Y 5-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
2020-01-22SenateChair votes No
2020-01-22SenatePending question, not ordered (20-Y 20-N)
2020-01-21SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-20SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-17SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (7-Y 5-N 2-A)
2020-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103674D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291556.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback