VA SB314 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0137)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0137)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Acquisition of nutrient offset credits. Allows a new or expanding facility registered under the Watershed General Permit to acquire nutrient offset credits, on land located in the same tributary as the facility, on which best management practices have been implemented that would achieve reductions greater than those currently required by federal or state law or the Chesapeake Bay TMDL Watershed Implementation Plan. The bill also allows the acquisition of credits or the allocation of credits under the general permit for a period longer than the current five-year restriction, subject to the approval of the State Water Control Board.
Title
Nutrient offset credits; new and expanding wastewater discharge facilities to acquire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0137) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 137 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB314ER) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed House with amendment (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-02-19 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB314S1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105182D-S1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105182D-S1 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101628D |
Same As/Similar To
HB448 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0377)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.19:15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.19:17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |