VA SB309 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Annexation. Extends the current moratorium on city annexations and county immunity actions by six years to 2024. Provisions that would trigger the early expiration of the moratorium if the General Assembly fails to appropriate certain amounts for local law-enforcement expenditures are exempted through the 2022-2024 biennium. The Commission on Local Government is directed to evaluate the structure of cities and counties in the Commonwealth and the impact of annexation upon localities. In doing so, the Commission shall consider alternatives to the current moratorium on annexation by cities. The Commission shall issue its findings and recommended policy changes to the General Assembly no later than December 1, 2018.
Title
Annexation; extends current moratorium on city annexations and county immunity actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 158 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB309ER) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB309S1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105140D-S1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105140D-S1 |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103788D |
Same As/Similar To
HB945 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364)