VA SB3 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disorderly conduct; students. Provides that an elementary or secondary school student is not guilty of disorderly conduct in a public place if the disorderly conduct occurred on the property of an elementary or secondary school, on a school bus, or at any activity conducted or sponsored by any elementary or secondary school.
Title
Disorderly conduct; students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 37-N) (Y: 53 N: 37 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 36-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 36-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355) | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enacted, Chapter 355 (effective 7/1/20) |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB3ER2) |
2020-03-12 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 37-N) |
2020-03-12 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (53-Y 37-N) |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2020-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020 | |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB3ER) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed House (64-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB3S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105818D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105818D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100173D |
Same As/Similar To
HB256 (Same As) 2020-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199)