VA SB294 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Methamphetamine precursors; sale and tracking; penalties. Requires the Department of State Police to enter into a memorandum of understanding to establish the Commonwealth's participation in a real-time electronic recordkeeping and monitoring system for the nonprescription sale of ephedrine or related compounds. Most pharmacies and retail distributors will be required to enter nonprescription sales of ephedrine or related compounds into the electronic system. The bill retains the existing sales limit of no more than 3.6 grams of ephedrine or related compounds per day per individual retail customer and no more than 9 grams per 30-day period. The bill is effective January 1, 2013.
Title
Methamphetamine precursors; sale and tracking, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160) | |
2012-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 160 (effective 1/1/13) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB294ER) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-0Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB294S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104362D-S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Incorporates SB14 | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104362D-S1 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103470D |
Same As/Similar To
SB14 (Similar To) 2012-01-18 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB1161 (Same As) 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252)
HB1161 (Same As) 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 248.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 265.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 265.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |