VA SB29 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on December 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Budget Bill. Amending Chapter 665 of the 2015 Acts of Assembly.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Uncontested committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Budget amendments available |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103289D |