VA SB287 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Incorporated by Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

School principals; incident reports. Requires that school principals report to law enforcement certain enumerated acts that may constitute a misdemeanor offense and report to the parents of any minor student who is the specific object of such act that the incident has been reported to law enforcement. Under current law, principals are required to make such reports only for such acts that may constitute a felony offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School principals; incident reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateIncorporated by Education and Health
2022-02-01SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2022-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2022-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100452D

Same As/Similar To

SB36 (Similar To) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022
SB36 (Similar To) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback