VA SB36 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

School principals; incident reports. Requires that school principals report to law enforcement certain enumerated acts that may constitute a misdemeanor offense and report to the parents of any minor student who is the specific object of such act that the incident has been reported to law enforcement. Under current law, principals are required to make such reports only for such acts that may constitute a felony offense. The bill provides, as an exception to the requirement to report any written threats against school personnel while on a school bus, on school property, or at a school-sponsored activity, that a principal is not required but may report to the local law-enforcement agency any such incident committed by a student who has an individualized education plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School principals; incident reports, written threats against school personnel, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 33-N) (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022
2022-04-27SenateCommunicated to Governor on April 27, 2022
2022-04-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022
2022-04-27HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2022-04-27SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2022-04-27SenateReenrolled bill text (SB36ER2)
2022-04-27HouseReenrolled
2022-04-27 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part.
2022-04-27HouseVOTE: Adoption (86-Y 13-N)
2022-04-27HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (86-Y 13-N)
2022-04-27SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (40-Y 0-N)
2022-04-27SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (19-Y 21-N)
2022-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2022-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
2022-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
2022-03-03SenateSigned by President
2022-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2022-03-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB36ER)
2022-03-02SenateEnrolled
2022-02-28HouseVOTE: Passage (66-Y 33-N)
2022-02-28HousePassed House (66-Y 33-N)
2022-02-28HouseRead third time
2022-02-25HouseRead second time
2022-02-23HouseReported from Education (18-Y 4-N)
2022-02-21HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2022-02-21HouseRead first time
2022-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2022-02-15SenatePassed Senate (26-Y 14-N)
2022-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2022-02-15SenatePrinted as engrossed 22106441D-ES1
2022-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB36ES1
2022-02-15SenateAmendment #3 by Senator Norment agreed to
2022-02-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2022-02-15SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Norment agreed to
2022-02-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2022-02-15SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Norment rejected
2022-02-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2022-02-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 22106441D-S1
2022-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2022-02-15SenateRead second time
2022-02-14SenatePassed by for the day
2022-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2022-02-10SenateCommittee substitute printed 22106441D-S1
2022-02-10SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2022-02-01SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-12-27SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-12-27SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100573D

Same As/Similar To

SB2 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB287 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB613 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB2 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB287 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB613 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Incorporated by Education and Health
HB4 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022
HB4 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+sum+SB36
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+SB36+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+SB36S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+SB36ES1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+SB36ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+SB36ER2+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/22106441D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+amd+SB36AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+amd+SB36ASR
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+amd+SB36AG
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+oth+SB36F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+oth+SB36FES1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+oth+SB36FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+S04V0141+SB0036
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV0357SB0036+SB0036
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV0458SB0036+SB0036
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV0457SB0036+SB0036
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+H09V0161+SB0036
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+HV1220+SB0036
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV1185SB0036+SB0036
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV1186SB0036+SB0036
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+HV1853+SB0036

Bill Comments

feedback