VA SB284 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship care; regulations. Directs the Department of Social Services to review current policies governing kinship care placements, propose regulations governing kinship care placements, and review the fiscal impact of the proposed regulations. The bill directs the Department of Social Services to report its recommendations and findings to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the Board of Social Services by January 1, 2016.
Title
Kinship care; DSS shall review current policy governing placement of children to avoid foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 530 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB284ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB284S1 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104559D-S1 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104559D-S1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (11-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100666D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Minors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare (Social Services)
Minors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare (Social Services)