VA SB28 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Eminent domain; costs. Eliminates specific provisions for the assessment of costs in eminent domain proceedings where the condemnor is a public service company, public service corporation, railroad, or government utility corporation and provides that all costs shall be assessed in the same manner, regardless of the identity of the condemnor. The bill exempts condemnation actions for easements adjudged at less than $10,000. The bill also provides that its provisions apply only to condemnation actions filed on or after July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain; eliminates specific provisions for assessment of costs in certain proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB28ER)
2020-03-07SenateEnrolled
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed by temporarily
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenatePrinted as engrossed 20100603D-E
2020-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB28E
2020-02-03SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-03SenateRead second time
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 1-N)
2020-01-16SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100603D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251245(n/a)See Bill Text
251245.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback