VA SB28 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Medical research on dogs and cats; prohibition on use of state funds. Prohibits the use of any funds appropriated, granted, or awarded by the Commonwealth by any person or entity, public or private, to directly fund medically unnecessary research classified under pain and distress category E by the U.S. Department of Agriculture on animal subjects. The direct funding of research shall not include the appropriation, grant, or award of funds for the construction or maintenance of facilities; the purchase or maintenance of general-use equipment; overhead costs; capital improvements; or faculty or employee salaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical research on dogs and cats; prohibition on use of state funds, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 771 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB28ER)
2018-03-10SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateTitle replaced 18107795D-H1
2018-03-08SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB28H1
2018-03-08HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107795D-H1
2018-03-08HouseRead third time
2018-03-07HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-06HouseRead second time
2018-03-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107795D-H1
2018-03-02HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
2018-02-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-14HouseRead first time
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-09SenateRead third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N)
2018-02-08SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB28S2
2018-02-08SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106991D-S2
2018-02-08SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-08SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18105009D-S1
2018-02-08SenateRead second time
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateSubstitute bill reprinted 18106991D-S2
2018-02-06SenateReported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
2018-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106991D-S2
2018-01-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105009D-S1
2018-01-11SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2017-11-20SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2017-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100502D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321162.32(n/a)See Bill Text
321162.33(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB28
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB28+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB28S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB28S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB28H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB28ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0771+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0008+SB0028
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0131+SB0028
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0351SB0028+SB0028
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0376SB0028+SB0028
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0206V0025+SB0028
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0201+SB0028
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1468+SB0028
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1105SB0028+SB0028

Bill Comments

feedback