VA SB268 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Animal disease violations. Authorizes the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to assess civil penalties not to exceed $1,000 per violation in lieu of criminal penalties for violations of the laws controlling livestock and poultry diseases and shooting enclosures, with the exception of violations of regulations to prevent and control avian influenza in the live-bird marketing system, which remain subject to both criminal and existing civil penalties. The bill designates moneys generated from any such civil penalties to be deposited into the Livestock and Poultry Disease Fund (the Fund), created by the bill. Moneys in the Fund are to be disbursed to control the spread of infectious diseases among animals. The bill contains technical amendments that reorganize the penalty provisions of Chapter 60 of Title 3.2 into a single new article.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal disease violations; criminal and civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
2016-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 563 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
2016-03-10SenateSigned by President
2016-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB268ER)
2016-03-08SenateEnrolled
2016-03-04SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2016-03-02HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2016-03-02HousePassed House with amendments (97-Y 0-N)
2016-03-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2016-03-02HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2016-03-02HouseRead third time
2016-03-01HousePassed by for the day
2016-02-29HousePassed by for the day
2016-02-26HousePassed by for the day
2016-02-25HouseRead second time
2016-02-24HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
2016-02-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2016-02-08HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2016-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2016-02-03HouseRead first time
2016-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2016-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2016-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-01-21SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2016-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2016-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100449D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326018(n/a)See Bill Text
326023(n/a)See Bill Text
326034(n/a)See Bill Text
326042(n/a)See Bill Text
326043(n/a)See Bill Text
326044(n/a)See Bill Text
326045(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+SB268
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB268+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB268ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0563+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S01V0010+SB0268
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0072SB0268+SB0268
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0090SB0268+SB0268
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0101V0019+SB0268
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H01V0096+SB0268
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1089+SB0268
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0856SB0268+SB0268

Bill Comments

feedback