VA SB267 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sexually violent predators; assessment protocol. Provides that each month the Director of the Board of Corrections (the Director) shall review a database of prisoners convicted of sexually violent offenses and, using an evidence-based assessment protocol approved by the Director and the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (the Commissioner), identify all such prisoners who appear to meet the definition of a sexually violent predator and are scheduled for release from prison within 24 months from the date of such review. Current law specifies that the assessment protocol to be used is the Static-99 or a comparable, scientifically validated instrument designated by the Commissioner. The bill also requires the Commissioner to report to the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Courts of Justice, the Senate Committees on Courts of Justice and Finance, and the Crime Commission on (i) the assessment protocol approved by the Director and the Commissioner, including the specific screening instrument adopted and the criteria used to determine whether a prisoner or defendant meets the definition of a sexually violent predator and (ii) the number of prisoners screened and the number of prisoners identified as meeting the definition of a sexually violent predator and referred for assessment. The report shall also include a comparison of the number of defendants identified as appearing to meet the definition of a sexually violent predator and referred for assessment in the previous year and the five years immediately prior thereto.
Title
Sexually violent predators; evidence-based assessment protocol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841) | |
2018-04-18 | House | Enacted, Chapter 841 (effective 7/1/18) |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB267ER2) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2018-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2018-04-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-04-18 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB267ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18103192D-E |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB267E |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103192D |