VA SB261 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DBHDS; evaluate qualifications and training of individuals performing evaluations of individuals subject to emergency custody orders; report. Directs the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to review requirements for qualifications, training, and oversight of individuals designated by community services boards to perform evaluations of individuals subject to emergency custody orders and to make recommendations for changes to such requirements. The Department shall report its findings by December 1, 2014.
Title
DBHDS; qualifications of individuals performing certain evaluations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 364 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB261ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Care |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101823D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1216 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)