VA SB253 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB253
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deeds of trust; fiduciary duties. Specifies that a trustee under a deed of trust has only the duties, rights, and obligations imposed and conferred on it by the deed of trust or by statute. The bill further requires that a trustee shall comply with all restrictive covenants regarding the affordability of the property and that a trustee under a deed of trust is a fiduciary for both the debtor and the creditor. This bill is in response to Crosby v. ALG Trustee, LLC, 296 Va. 561 (2018). Deeds of trust; fiduciary duties. Specifies that a trustee under a deed of trust has only the duties, rights, and obligations imposed and conferred on it by the deed of trust or by statute. The bill further requires that a trustee shall comply with all restrictive covenants regarding the affordability of the property and that a trustee under a deed of trust is a fiduciary for both the debtor and the creditor. This bill is in response to Crosby v. ALG Trustee, LLC, 296 Va. 561 (2018).
Title
Deeds of trust; fiduciary duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Petersen rejected (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Petersen reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Petersen rejected (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Petersen reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-02-28 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB253S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Petersen rejected (18-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Petersen reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Chair votes Yea |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106654D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106654D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102906D |
Same As/Similar To
SB253 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote