VA SB253 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Deeds of trust; fiduciary duties. Specifies that a trustee under a deed of trust has only the duties, rights, and obligations imposed and conferred on it by the deed of trust or by statute. The bill further requires that a trustee shall comply with all restrictive covenants regarding the affordability of the property and that a trustee under a deed of trust is a fiduciary for both the debtor and the creditor. This bill is in response to Crosby v. ALG Trustee, LLC, 296 Va. 561 (2018).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deeds of trust; fiduciary duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Petersen rejected (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Petersen reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-27HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
2020-02-10SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB253S1
2020-02-10SenateAmendments by Senator Petersen rejected (18-Y 21-N)
2020-02-10SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-10SenateRead second time
2020-02-07SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-06SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-06SenateAmendments by Senator Petersen reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-05SenateChair votes Yes
2020-02-05SenateAmendments by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
2020-02-05SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106654D-S1
2020-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-05SenateRead second time
2020-02-04SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-03SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106654D-S1
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
2020-01-16SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102906D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
551320(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB253&201+sum+SB253
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB253+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB253S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0126+SB0253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0257SB0253+SB0253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0354SB0253+SB0253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0379SB0253+SB0253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0453SB0253+SB0253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0473SB0253+SB0253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0511SB0253+SB0253
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0512SB0253+SB0253

Bill Comments

feedback