VA SB251 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmacy benefits managers; licensure and regulation. Provides that no person is authorized to provide pharmacy benefits management services or otherwise act as a pharmacy benefits manager without first obtaining a license from the State Corporation Commission. The measure prohibits a carrier on its own or through its contracted pharmacy benefits manager or representative of a pharmacy benefits manager from (i) causing or knowingly permitting the use of any advertisement, promotion, solicitation, representation, proposal, or offer that is untrue; (ii) charging a pharmacist or pharmacy a fee related to the adjudication of a claim other than a reasonable fee for an initial claim submission; (iii) reimbursing a pharmacy or pharmacist an amount less than the amount that the pharmacy benefits manager reimburses a pharmacy benefits manager affiliate for providing the same pharmacist services, calculated on a per-unit basis using the same generic product identifier or generic code number and reflecting all drug manufacturer's rebates, direct and indirect administrative fees, and costs and any remuneration; or (iv) penalizing or retaliating against a pharmacist or pharmacy for exercising rights provided by this measure. The measure also prohibits a carrier from (a) imposing provider accreditation standards or certification requirements inconsistent with, more stringent than, or in addition to requirements of the Virginia Board of Pharmacy or other state or federal entity; (b) including any mail order pharmacy or pharmacy benefits manager affiliate in calculating or determining network adequacy; or (c) conducting spread pricing in the Commonwealth. The measure also imposes recordkeeping and reporting requirements. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefits managers; licensure and regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation rejected (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1288)
2020-05-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1288 (effective - see bill)
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 22, 2020
2020-04-22SenateCommunicated to Governor
2020-04-22SenateSecond reconsideration requires unanimous consent
2020-04-22SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation rejected (35-Y 3-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N)
2020-04-22SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-04-22SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB251ER)
2020-03-02SenateEnrolled
2020-02-25SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-21HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
2020-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB251S1
2020-02-03SenateAmendments by Senator Hanger rejected
2020-02-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105876D-S1
2020-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-03SenateRead second time
2020-01-31SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-30SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105876D-S1
2020-01-27SenateIncorporates SB862 (Pillion)
2020-01-27SenateIncorporates SB252 (Edwards)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2020-01-15SenateAssigned C&L sub: Health Insurance
2020-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101086D

Same As/Similar To

HB1290 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
SB252 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
SB862 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823465(n/a)See Bill Text
3823466(n/a)See Bill Text
3823467(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB251&201+sum+SB251
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB251+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB251S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB251ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB251ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1288+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0054+SB0251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0232SB0251+SB0251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0303SB0251+SB0251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0284+SB0251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1184+SB0251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0944SB0251+SB0251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1969SB0251+SB0251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1990SB0251+SB0251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2003SB0251+SB0251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2047SB0251+SB0251

Bill Comments

feedback