VA HB1290 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmacy benefits managers; licensure and regulation. Provides that no person is authorized to provide pharmacy benefits management services or otherwise act as a pharmacy benefits manager without first obtaining a license from the State Corporation Commission. The measure prohibits a carrier on its own or through its contracted pharmacy benefits manager or representative of a pharmacy benefits manager from (i) causing or knowingly permitting the use of any advertisement, promotion, solicitation, representation, proposal, or offer that is untrue; (ii) charging a pharmacist or pharmacy a fee related to the adjudication of a claim other than a reasonable fee for an initial claim submission; (iii) reimbursing a pharmacy or pharmacist an amount less than the amount that the pharmacy benefits manager reimburses a pharmacy benefits manager affiliate for providing the same pharmacist services, calculated on a per-unit basis using the same generic product identifier or generic code number and reflecting all drug manufacturer's rebates, direct and indirect administrative fees, and costs and any remuneration; or (iv) penalizing or retaliating against a pharmacist or pharmacy for exercising rights provided by this measure. The measure also prohibits a carrier from (a) imposing provider accreditation standards or certification requirements inconsistent with, more stringent than, or in addition to requirements of the Virginia Board of Pharmacy or other state or federal entity; (b) including any mail order pharmacy or pharmacy benefits manager affiliate in calculating or determining network adequacy; or (c) conducting spread pricing in the Commonwealth. The measure also imposes recordkeeping and reporting requirements. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefits managers; licensure and regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
2020-03-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 219 (effective - see bill)
2020-03-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSigned by President
2020-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1290ER)
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1290H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107170D-H1
2020-02-06HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseIncorporates HB1479 (Samirah)
2020-02-04HouseIncorporates HB1459 (O'Quinn)
2020-02-04HouseIncorporates HB1659 (Head)
2020-02-04HouseIncorporates HB1292 (Hodges)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107170D-H1
2020-02-04HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103195D

Same As/Similar To

SB251 (Same As) 2020-05-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1288)
HB1292 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
HB1459 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
HB1479 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
HB1659 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823465(n/a)See Bill Text
3823466(n/a)See Bill Text
3823467(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1290
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1290+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1290H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1290ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0219+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1402V0021+HB1290
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0166+HB1290
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0634+HB1290
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0166+HB1290
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0734HB1290+HB1290
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0769HB1290+HB1290

Bill Comments

feedback